WA HB1038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of tasting rooms allowed under a domestic winery license.
Title
Increasing the number of tasting rooms allowed under a domestic winery license.
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Chapter 238, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-19 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2016-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5426 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.