WA SB5426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of tasting rooms allowed under a domestic winery license.
Title
Increasing the number of tasting rooms allowed under a domestic winery license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-21 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1038 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.