WA HB1018 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing breed-based dog regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing breed-based dog regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-02-04HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2016-02-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-04HouseJUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-11HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-02-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2014-12-08HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback