WA HB1015 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning exemption from immunization.
Title
Concerning exemption from immunization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-02-14 | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-02-14 | Placed on third reading. | |
2011-02-14 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2011-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2011-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-31 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-01-31 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-12-13 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5005 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.