WA HB1005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding foreclosure and distraint sales of manufactured/mobile or park model homes.
Title
Regarding foreclosure and distraint sales of manufactured/mobile or park model homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2018-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5131 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.