VT SR0012 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Adopted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Adopted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate resolution amending the permanent rules of the Senate
Title
Senate resolution amending the permanent rules of the Senate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-04-19 | Senate | SenatorLyons, Baruth, Benning, Campbell, Flory, and Mazza moved to amend |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-04-19 | Senate | SenatorAyer, Baruth, Benning, Campbell, Flory, and Mazza moved to amend |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Pending Question: Shall the Senate adopt the resolution? |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Special order for Tuesday, April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Consideration postponed Tuesday, April 19, 2016 at 9:30am on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Resolutions for Adoption |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34 |