VT S0349 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Committed to Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Ashe
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Committed to Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Ashe
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to emergency funding for local government
Title
An act relating to emergency funding for local government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-26 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-25 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-24 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-06-24 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-24 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-24 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to |
2020-06-23 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-23 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Gannon of Wilmington, Gardner of Richmond, Harrison of Chittenden, Brownell of Pownal, Colston of Winooski, Copeland Hanzas of Bradford, Hooper of Burlington, Kitzmiller of Montpelier, LaClair of Barre Town, Mrowicki of Putney, and Palasik of Milton agreed to |
2020-06-23 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-06-03 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |