VT S0332 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - New Business/Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to regulating student loan servicers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to regulating student loan servicers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-14SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2020-02-14SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Finance
2020-02-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-02-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-02-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback