VT S0304 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Vermont’s career and technical education programs
Title
An act relating to Vermont’s career and technical education programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Weeks for Committee on Education |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Campion |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |