VT S0301 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Agriculture Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Agriculture Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-04-25 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Wrenner for Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Rule 31 suspended and bill not referred to Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Kitchel |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Committed to the Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Starr |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |