VT S0301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous telecommunications changes
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous telecommunications changes
Sponsors
Sen. Randolph Brock [R] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Brian Collamore [R] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] |
Sen. James McNeil [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on July 1, 2020 |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2020-06-25 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-24 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Brock |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senator Brock moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2020-06-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-17 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-16 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-06-16 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-12 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-12 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-12 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2020-06-12 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2020-06-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-05-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |