VT S0290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 24, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 24, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Restoring Solvency To The Unemployment Trust Fund
Title
An Act Relating To Restoring Solvency To The Unemployment Trust Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 19, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-05 | House message House passed bill in concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-05 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-05 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 9 | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-05 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-05-05 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 121 | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Zuckerman of Burlington demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-05 | First Instance of amendment disagreed to | |
2010-05-05 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 123 | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Davis of Washington demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-05 | Third Instance of amendment disagreed to | |
2010-05-05 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 113 | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Poirier of Barre City demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-05 | Second Instance of amendment disagreed to | |
2010-05-05 | Pending the question, shall the Proposal of Amendment be amended as offered by Rep. Davis of Washington, Poirier of Barre City, and Zuckerman of Burlington, the question was divided | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Davis of Washington, Poirier of Barre City, and Zuckerman of Burlington moved to amend the bill | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Sharpe of Bristol, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-05-05 | Read Second Time | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-04 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 102 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 86, Nays = 49 | |
2010-05-04 | Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-04 | Motion for rules suspension as moved by Rep. Nease of Johnson disagreed to | |
2010-05-04 | Rep. Nease of Johnson moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2010-05-04 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-04 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-03 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-03 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings, text | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Racine and Mazza, text | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment of Senator(s) Ashe, Illuzzi, and Scott, as amended, agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Senator(s) Nitka and Campbell moved to amend motion to amend offered by Senators Ashe, Illuzzi and Scott, which was agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe, Illuzzi, and Scott, text | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi, text | |
2010-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2010-02-23 | Committed to the Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-02-23 |