VT S0289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to protecting consumers and promoting an open Internet in Vermont.
Title
An act relating to protecting consumers and promoting an open Internet in Vermont.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2018-04-27 | House | Speaker appointed Carr of Brandon, Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs and Sibilia of Dover as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, Campion, and Sirotkin |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-25 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-20 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-19 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Conquest of Newbury, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-18 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-04-18 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Conquest of Newbury, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the report of the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-04-18 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-04-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senator Brock explained vote |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senator Benning explained vote |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Brock, text |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Brock moved to amend bill |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senator Flory moved to postpone action for two legislative days, which was not agreed to. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as moved by Senator Brock |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-01-31 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |