VT S0287 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 16, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 16, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Involuntary Treatment And Medication
Title
An Act Relating To Involuntary Treatment And Medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - Shall the house proposal of amendment be amended as proposed by Rep. Moran of Wardsboro? (Y: 30 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 16, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 16, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 12, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator White for Committee, text |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2014-05-09 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) |
2014-05-09 | House | Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2014-05-05 | House | Speaker appointed Koch of Barre Town, Donahue of Northfield and Lippert of Hinesburg as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators White, Ayer, and Sears |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator White |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-05 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-03 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-02 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to |
2014-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 101 |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Moran of Wardsboro moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was disagreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 132, Nays = 6 |
2014-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield, Pugh of South Burlington, Batchelor of Derby, Burditt of West Rutland, Conquest of Newbury, Donaghy of Poultney, Fay of St. Johnsbury, Frank of Underhill, French of Randolph, Goodwin of Weston, Grad of Moretown, Haas of Rochester, Krowinski of Burlington, Lippert of Hinesburg, Marek of Newfane, McFaun of Barre Town, Mrowicki of Putney, O'Brien of Richmond, Strong of Albany, Toll of Danville, Waite-Simpson of Essex, and Wizowaty of Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to. |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield, Batchelor of Derby, French of Randolph, Haas of Rochester, McFaun of Barre Town, and Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to. |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Rep. Koch of Barre Town reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-30 | House | Rep. Koch of Barre Town moved to postpone action until May 1, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the committee on Human Services be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. |
2014-03-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin and Snelling |
2014-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senator Snelling explained vote |
2014-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 4 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare with recommendation of amendment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare with the report of Committee on Judiciary intact, on motion of Senator Sears |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |