VT S0287 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by Governor on May 8, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by Governor on May 8, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Licensing And Regulation Of Loan Servicers
Title
An Act Relating To The Licensing And Regulation Of Loan Servicers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Signed by Governor on May 8, 2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Delivered to Governor on May 4, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-04-29 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-04-29 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-04-29 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-04-29 | Consideration resumed | |
2010-04-29 | Consideration Postponed/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-28 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-28 | Consideration postponed House proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-27 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-27 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-26 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-23 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-21 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development and Ways and Means agreed to | |
2010-04-21 | Rep. Masland of Thetford, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-21 | Rep. Clerkin of Hartford reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2010-02-19 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-02-16 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-02-16 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-02-12 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-02-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-12 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 | |
2010-02-09 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |