VT S0285 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
Pending: House Corrections and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
Pending: House Corrections and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Furlough Of Offenders 65 Years Of Age And Older
Title
An Act Relating To The Furlough Of Offenders 65 Years Of Age And Older
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Motion to amend bill agreed to |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Benning for the Committee on Institutions moved to amend the bill |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning on behalf of the Committee on Institutions |
2014-02-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Institutions |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |