VT S0285 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Promoting Health Care Coverage For Farmers
Title
An Act Relating To Promoting Health Care Coverage For Farmers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-23 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-03-23 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-03-19 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-19 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2010-02-04 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |