VT S0282 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on June 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Updating And Clarifying Provisions Regarding Commercial Driver Licenses And Commercial Motor Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Updating And Clarifying Provisions Regarding Commercial Driver Licenses And Commercial Motor Vehicles

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on June 1, 2010
2010-05-12 Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2010
2010-05-06 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-06 As passed by Senate and House
2010-05-06 Committee of Conference report adopted
2010-05-06 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Scott for Committee, text
2010-05-06 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-05-06 Committee of Conference Report
2010-05-05 House message House adopted Conference Committee report
2010-05-05 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-05 Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
2010-05-05 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-04-23 House message House appointed Conference Committee members
2010-04-23 Speaker appointed Aswad of Burlington, Brennan of Colchester and Courcelle of Rutland City as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2010-04-23 Committee of Conference appointed
2010-04-22 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-04-22 Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Scott, and Mazza
2010-04-21 House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-04-21 Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-20 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-19 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-16 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2010-04-14 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-14 Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to withdraw amendment
2010-04-14 Rep. Donahue of Northfield and Grad of Moretown moved to amend the bill
2010-04-14 Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
2010-04-13 Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Aswad of Burlington
2010-04-09 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-09 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Transportation agreed to
2010-04-09 Rep. Aswad of Burlington reported for the committee on Transportation
2010-04-09 Read Second Time
2010-02-17 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation
2010-02-12 As passed by Senate
2010-02-12 Read 3rd time & passed
2010-02-12 New Business/Third Reading
2010-02-10 3rd reading ordered
2010-02-10 Recommendation of amendment agreed to
2010-02-10 Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel, text
2010-02-10 Read 2nd time
2010-02-10 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel
2010-02-10 Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-02-09 Consideration postponed without objection
2010-02-09 Consideration postponed without objection
2010-02-09 New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-02-09 New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-02-05 Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-02-04 Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback