VT S0280 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to laws related to vehicles
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to laws related to vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-10 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-10 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved to concur with the Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved to postpone action until May 10, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Perchlik, Mazza, Chittenden, Ingalls, and Kitchel |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Mazza, Chittenden, Ingalls, and Kitchel |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Mazza, Chittenden, Ingalls, and Kitchel |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Mazza, Chittenden, Ingalls, and Kitchel |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-26 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-26 | House | Rep. Rogers of Waterville, Hango of Berkshire, Pearl of Danville, Sims of Craftsbury, and Surprenant of Barnard moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2022-04-26 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-22 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-22 | House | Report of Committee on Transportation agreed to |
2022-04-22 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-04-22 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes reported for the Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-22 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-21 | House | Rep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to postpone action until April 22, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-04-21 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-20 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-02-11 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |