VT S0280 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Advisory Council on Child Poverty and Strengthening Families
Title
An act relating to the Advisory Council on Child Poverty and Strengthening Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-07 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-04 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-04 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to |
2018-05-04 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-04 | House | Rep. Yacovone of Morristown recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-04 | House | Rep. Noyes of Wolcott reported for the committee on Human Services |
2018-05-04 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |