VT S0278 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Department Of Banking, Insurance, Securities, And Health Care Administration
Title
An Act Relating To The Department Of Banking, Insurance, Securities, And Health Care Administration
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-05-05 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-05-05 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-04 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-03 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-30 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-29 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-29 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to | |
2010-04-29 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski agreed to | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. Masland of Thetford, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-04-29 | Read Second Time | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2010-02-09 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-02-04 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-02-04 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Ayer | |
2010-02-04 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2010-02-03 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-02-02 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-02-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-02 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-01-29 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-01-26 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |