VT S0269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to blockchain business development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to blockchain business development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2018
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-12SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Clarkson for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-11SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-11HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2018-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-05SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2018-05-04HouseSpeaker appointed O'Sullivan of Burlington, McCoy of Poultney and Young of Glover as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-05-04SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-04SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Clarkson, Soucy, and Balint
2018-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Clarkson
2018-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-04SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-03SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-02HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-02HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-01HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2018-05-01HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2018-05-01HouseRep. Young of Glover recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2018-05-01HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-01HouseRead Second Time
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2018-03-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-03-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-20Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-20SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-20SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2018-03-20SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-20SenateSubstitute Recommendation/Proposal of amendment, by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2018-03-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2018-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2018-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback