VT S0264 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on June 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on June 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Stop And Hauling Charges
Title
An Act Relating To Stop And Hauling Charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on June 1, 2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-11 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-11 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2010-05-11 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Giard for Committee, text | |
2010-05-11 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-11 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2010-05-11 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2010-05-08 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2010-05-08 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-27 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-04-27 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kittell, Starr, and Giard | |
2010-04-23 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2010-04-23 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Wright of Burlington | |
2010-04-23 | Speaker appointed Ainsworth of Royalton, McAllister of Highgate and Malcolm of Pawlet as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Malcolm of Pawlet | |
2010-04-21 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-04-21 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Giard | |
2010-04-21 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Giard on behalf of Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-21 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-20 | Consideration postponed House proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-19 | Consideration postponed House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-16 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-16 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-15 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-14 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Read Third time | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-09 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2010-04-09 | Rep. McNeil of Rutland Town reported for the committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-09 | Read Second Time | |
2010-03-24 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-23 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-03-23 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-03-19 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2010-03-19 | Reported without recommendation by Senator Giard for Committee on Finance | |
2010-03-19 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Giard for Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-19 | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-19 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2010-01-05 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |