VT S0263 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 11, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 11, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Authority Of Assistant Judges In Child Support Contempt Proceedings
Title
An Act Relating To The Authority Of Assistant Judges In Child Support Contempt Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 11, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 11, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-07 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-07 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-05-07 | House | Rep. Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-07 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-03-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |