VT S0262 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Insurance Coverage For Autism Diagnosis And Treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Insurance Coverage For Autism Diagnosis And Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
2010-05-12 Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2010
2010-05-07 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-07 As passed by Senate and House
2010-05-07 House proposal of amendment concurred in
2010-05-07 House proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-07 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-07 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-07 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2010-05-06 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-06 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-06 Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-06 Third Reading Ordered
2010-05-06 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 0
2010-05-06 Rep. Morrissey of Bennington demanded yeas and nays
2010-05-06 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
2010-05-06 Rep. O'Brien of Richmond moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2010-05-06 Amendment of Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2010-05-06 Amendment of Committee on Health Care agreed to
2010-05-06 Rep. Larson of Burlington, recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2010-05-06 Rep. O'Brien of Richmond reported for the committee on Health Care
2010-05-06 Read Second Time
2010-05-06 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-05 Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2010-04-23 Committed to Committee on Health Care by motion of Rep. Pugh of South Burlington
2010-03-24 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
2010-03-23 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-03-23 As passed by Senate
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time & passed
2010-03-23 New Business/Third Reading
2010-03-19 3rd reading ordered
2010-03-19 Recommendation of amendment agreed to
2010-03-19 Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Carris for Committee on Finance
2010-03-19 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2010-03-19 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2010-03-18 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2010-03-18 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2010-03-17 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2010-03-17 New Business/Second Reading
2010-03-16 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2010-01-05 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback