VT S0261 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to limiting the sentence of life without the possibility of parole

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to limiting the sentence of life without the possibility of parole

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-12SenateAs passed by Senate
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time & passed on division Yeas 18, Nays 8
2020-03-12SenateMotion agreed to
2020-03-12SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Sears moved to amend bill
2020-03-12SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2020-03-12SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-03-11Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2020-03-11SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2020-03-11SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-11SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-11SenateConsideration postponed March 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-10SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-10SenateConsideration postponed to March 11, 2020
2020-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-28SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-02-28SenateConsideration postponed March 11, 2020
2020-02-27SenateConsideration postponed to March 11, 2020
2020-03-11SenateConsideration postponed to March 11, 2020 on motion of Senator Sears
2020-02-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback