VT S0260 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Malt And Vinous Beverage Tastings
Title
An Act Relating To Malt And Vinous Beverage Tastings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collins for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with recommendation of amendment |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |