VT S0255 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to captive insurance
Title
An act relating to captive insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020 |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 15, 2020 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 9, 2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-05-29 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-05-29 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-05-29 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-05-27 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-05-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-05-22 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-05-22 | House | Read Third time |
2020-05-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-05-20 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2020-05-20 | House | Rep. Ralph of Hartland reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-05-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 5/15/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-01-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |