VT S0254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to union organizing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to union organizing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-26SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-19SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-14SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-12SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-05SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-04SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-05-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-29SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-17SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-16SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-14SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-11SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-10SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-10SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-09SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-09SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-08SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-08SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-06SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-03SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-03SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-04-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-30SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-03-27SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-03-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback