VT S0252 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the sale of lottery products
Title
An act relating to the sale of lottery products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |