VT S0251 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Amendments To Laws Pertaining To Motor Vehicles
Title
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Amendments To Laws Pertaining To Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 11, 2012 | |
2012-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Hartwell for Committee, text | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Hartwell, Westman, and Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Speaker appointed Lanpher of Vergennes, Bissonnette of Winooski and Bohi of Hartford as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-27 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2012-04-24 | Rep. Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes reported for the committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-24 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-15 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-13 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-13 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-02 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-02 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-01 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-02-28 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |