VT S0245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to notice to patients of new health care provider affiliations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to notice to patients of new health care provider affiliations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-25SenateSigned by Governor on May 25, 2016
2016-05-23SenateDelivered to Governor on May 23, 2016
2016-05-06SenateRules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2016-05-06SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2016-05-06SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2016-05-06SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2016-05-06SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2016-05-06SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2016-05-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2016-05-05SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2016-05-06HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2016-05-03HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2016-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2016-05-03HouseRep. Pearson of Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2016-05-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2016-05-02HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to.
2016-05-02HouseRep. Pearson of Burlington reported for the committee on Health Care
2016-05-02HouseRead Second Time
2016-03-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2016-03-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2016-03-24SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Ashe, Sirotkin, and Zuckerman
2016-03-24SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Ayer, Ashe, Collamore, Lyons, Pollina, and Sirotkin
2016-03-24SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe, Sirotkin, and Zuckerman
2016-03-24SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer, Ashe, Collamore, Lyons, Pollina, and Sirotkin
2016-03-24SenateCalled Up
2016-03-24SenateCalled up by Senator Ayer & placed on action calendar for Thursday, March 24, 2016
2016-03-23SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe and Sirotkin
2016-03-22SenateOrdered to lie on motion of Senator Baruth
2016-03-22SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer, Ashe, Collamore, Lyons, Pollina, and Sirotkin
2016-03-22SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2016-03-18SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2016-03-17SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2016-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2016-03-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2016-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2016-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare amended as moved by Senator Ayer
2016-03-15SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health & Welfare
2016-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2016-03-15SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2016-03-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2016-03-11SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2016-03-10SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth & Welfare
2016-01-05SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health & Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback