VT S0241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the makeup and duties of the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Committee
Title
An act relating to the makeup and duties of the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-12 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-11 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-11 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-04-26 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Committee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Ayer |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |