VT S0241 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulation of marijuana
Title
An act relating to regulation of marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 12 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 13 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 13 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senator Balint explained vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 12 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Rodgers and Zuckerman |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill disagreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senator Lyons requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Starr, Collamore, Flory, and Mullin |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senator Rodgers requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Rodgers and Zuckerman |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) White |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers and Zuckerman |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) White |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2016-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 13 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senator White requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, text |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Ashe, Benning, and White, text |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Substitute amendment agreed to |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senator(s) Sears motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers and Zuckerman, text |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Point of order overruled by the President |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Point of order raised by Senator(s) Mullin |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers and Zuckerman |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears, Ashe, Benning, and White |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |