VT S0238 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Signed by Governor on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Signed by Governor on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To A Study On Access To Driving Privileges In Vermont
Title
An Act Relating To A Study On Access To Driving Privileges In Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Signed by Governor on May 1, 2012 | |
2012-04-27 | Delivered to Governor on April 27, 2012 | |
2012-04-17 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-04-17 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-17 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-16 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-13 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-11 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-11 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 118 | |
2012-04-11 | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Judiciary which was disagreed to | |
2012-04-11 | Read Third time | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-10 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2012-04-06 | Rep. Rep. Burke of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-10 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-29 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-27 | Senator Brock explained vote | |
2012-03-27 | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 | |
2012-03-27 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-23 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2012-03-23 | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-23 | Reported favorably by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-23 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-22 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onTransportation | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2012-03-21 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onTransportation | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2012-03-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-13 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Transportation with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Kittell | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-13 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |