VT S0237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to providing representation to needy persons concerning immigration matters
Title
An act relating to providing representation to needy persons concerning immigration matters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 40 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-18 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-11 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-11 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-04-11 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield, Willhoit of St. Johnsbury, and Kimbell of Woodstock moved to amend the bill |
2018-04-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-10 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 40 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |