VT S0227 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
Pending: House Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
Pending: House Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the provision of personal care products by lodging establishments
Title
An act relating to the provision of personal care products by lodging establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Bray |
2020-06-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by Senator Bray, Campion, MacDonald, Parent, and Rodgers |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Campion, MacDonald, Parent, and Rodgers, text |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray, Campion, MacDonald, Parent, and Rodgers |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-06-08 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |