VT S0224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - House message House appointed Conference Committee members
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to co-payment limits for visits to chiropractors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to co-payment limits for visits to chiropractors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker appointed Lippert of Hinesburg, Houghton of Essex and Jickling of Randolph as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-09SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Ayer, and Campion
2018-05-09SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Cummings
2018-05-09SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-09HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2018-05-09SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-08SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-07HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-07HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-04HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-04HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to.
2018-05-04HouseRep. Jickling of Randolph reported for the committee on Health Care
2018-05-04HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-04HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-03-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2018-03-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2018-03-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-03-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-03-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-25SenateCommittee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ayer
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback