VT S0222 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To State Recognition Of Native American Indian Tribes In Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To State Recognition Of Native American Indian Tribes In Vermont

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on May 14, 2010
2010-05-05 As passed by Senate and House
2010-05-05 House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2010-05-05 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-05 Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2010-05-05 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-04 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2010-05-04 House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposals of amendment on roll call requested by Senator Miller, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0
2010-05-04 Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Miller; text
2010-05-04 House proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-04 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-03 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-03 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2010-04-30 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-04-30 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-30 Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2010-04-30 Rep. Webb of Shelburne moved to withdraw amendment
2010-04-30 Rep. Webb of Shelburne moved to amend the House proposal of amendment
2010-04-30 Rep. Ram of Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2010-04-29 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-29 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 132, Nays = 5
2010-04-29 Rep. Consejo of Sheldon demanded yeas and nays
2010-04-29 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to
2010-04-29 Rep. Ram of Burlington reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2010-04-29 Read Second Time
2010-03-19 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2010-03-18 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time & passed
2010-03-18 New Business/Third Reading
2010-03-17 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Nitka, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0
2010-03-17 Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2010-03-17 Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Miller for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-03-17 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-03-17 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2010-03-16 Consideration postponed without objection
2010-03-16 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-03-16 New Business/Second Reading
2010-03-12 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-01-05 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback