VT S0220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-12 - Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-12 - Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to professional regulation
Title
An act relating to professional regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanette White [D] | Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Christopher Bray [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] |
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] | Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on October 6, 2020 |
2020-09-18 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-09-17 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-09-17 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-09-17 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-09-17 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-16 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-15 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-09-15 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-15 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-11 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2020-09-11 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-11 | House | Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2020-09-11 | House | Rep. Colston of Winooski reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2020-09-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Ashe, Pearson, Campion, Hardy, and Perchlik |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) White |
2020-06-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman, text |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Balint for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Cummings, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman to recommendation of amendment of Government Operations committee |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |