VT S0219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to ensuring compliance with the U.S. and Vermont Constitutions in the use of public funds for tuition
Title
An act relating to ensuring compliance with the U.S. and Vermont Constitutions in the use of public funds for tuition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Education |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |