VT S0216 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on June 2, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on June 2, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prescription drugs
Title
An act relating to prescription drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 2, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mullin for Committee, text |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) |
2016-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2016-05-02 | House | Speaker appointed Lippert of Hinesburg, Pearson of Burlington and Bancroft of Westford as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2016-05-02 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mullin, Sirotkin, and Ashe |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-26 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2016-04-26 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Health Care |
2016-04-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2016-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |