VT S0215 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Allowed to become law without signature of Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Allowed to become law without signature of Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Administering, Implementing, And Financing Water Quality Improvement In Vermont
Title
An Act Relating To Administering, Implementing, And Financing Water Quality Improvement In Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor |
2014-02-26 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2014-02-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-20 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2014-02-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2014-02-07 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |