VT S0215 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Evaluating Net Costs Of Government Purchasing
Title
An Act Relating To Evaluating Net Costs Of Government Purchasing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence | |
2012-04-25 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-04-25 | House message House passed bill in concurrence | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. Rep. Hubert of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-25 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-25 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-03-27 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-22 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-22 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-22 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Hartwell on behalf of the Committee on Institutions moved to amend bill | |
2012-03-22 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-21 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-21 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-21 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations | |
2012-03-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |