VT S0214 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 18, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 18, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Vermont Energy Act Of 2012
Title
An Act Relating To The Vermont Energy Act Of 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 18, 2012 | |
2012-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-04 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-04 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 34 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-04 | Amendment of Rep. Olsen of Jamaica ruled not germane | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Senator Benning explained vote | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposals of amendment on roll call requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 4 | |
2012-05-02 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-02 | Proposal of amendment amended on motion of Senator(s) Ashe | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to as secondly moved by Senator Benning, on a division, yeas 7, Nays 14 | |
2012-05-02 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Starr, Failed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 9, Nays = 16 | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to as firstly moved by Senator Benning, on a roll call | |
2012-05-02 | Question divided on demand of Senator Benning | |
2012-05-02 | Senator Benning moved to amend the proposal of amendment of Senator Lyons | |
2012-05-02 | Point of order sustained by the President | |
2012-05-02 | Point of order raised by Senator Lyons on ground that proposed amendment was not germane | |
2012-05-02 | Senator Brock moved to amend proposal of amendment of Senator Lyons, text: | |
2012-05-02 | Proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-02 | Motion by Senator Lyons that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-01 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-01 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Lyons | |
2012-05-01 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-28 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Read Third time | |
2012-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Rep. Rep. Cheney of Norwich reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-28 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) MacDonald on behalf of Finance Committee | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Campbell | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) MacDonald on behalf of the Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-22 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-21 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Campbell | |
2012-03-21 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-20 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-16 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-16 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to | |
2012-03-16 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-15 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2012-03-14 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |