VT S0213 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Rep. Head of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Rep. Head of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To An Employee's Use Of Benefits
Title
An Act Relating To An Employee's Use Of Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - Shall the amendment offered by Rep. Moran of Wardsboro be substituted for the amendment offered by Rep. Stevens of Shoreham and others? (Y: 62 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - Shall the bill be committed to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development? (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - Shall the bill be committed to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development? (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2014-05-05 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 62, Nays = 61 |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Moran of Wardsboro moved to substitute an amendment for the amendment offered by Rep. Stevens of Shoreham, Connor of Fairfield, and Conquest of Newbury which was agreed to |
2014-05-05 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 72 |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Bouchard of Colchester moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was disagreed to |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Rep. Moran of Wardsboro reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Moran of Wardsboro moved to postpone action until May 5, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-04-30 | House | Motion to Relieve Committee by Rep. Heath of Westford agreed to and bill placed on calendar for notice on May 1, 2014. |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-02-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |