VT S0205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to criminal and civil surcharges
Title
An act relating to criminal and civil surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |