VT S0203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to systemic improvements of the mental health system
Title
An act relating to systemic improvements of the mental health system
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Ayer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-04 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-05-04 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2018-05-03 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Ayer |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senator Ayer moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-30 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-25 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-25 | House | Amendment offered by Rep. Hooper of Montpelier, Christensen of Weathersfield, Donahue of Northfield, Dunn of Essex, Hebert of Vernon, Houghton of Essex, and Lippert of Hinesburg further amended as recommended by Rep. Hooper of Montpelier |
2018-04-25 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-04-25 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Hooper of Montpelier, Christensen of Weathersfield, Donahue of Northfield, Dunn of Essex, Hebert of Vernon, Houghton of Essex, and Lippert of Hinesburg |
2018-04-25 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier, Christensen of Weathersfield, Donahue of Northfield, Dunn of Essex, Hebert of Vernon, Houghton of Essex, and Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-24 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2018-04-24 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-24 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the committee on Health Care |
2018-04-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-04-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-04-17 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Health Care. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |