VT S0202 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Regulation Of Flood Hazard Areas, River Corridors, And Stream Alteration
Title
An Act Relating To Regulation Of Flood Hazard Areas, River Corridors, And Stream Alteration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 11, 2012 | |
2012-05-02 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-27 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 122, Nays = 9 | |
2012-04-27 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Read Third time | |
2012-04-27 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Deen of Westminster agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Olsen of Jamaica agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Munger of South Burlington agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 14 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. Rep. Deen of Westminster reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-04-26 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-28 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons | |
2012-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-22 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-21 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-15 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |