VT S0201 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to best management practices for trapping
Title
An act relating to best management practices for trapping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-10 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-09 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to |
2022-05-09 | House | Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-05-09 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |